Exponents - Review of Simple Multiplying and Dividing

Grab a pen to help with these questions on exponents!

Exponents - Review of Simple Multiplying and Dividing

This Math quiz is called 'Exponents - Review of Simple Multiplying and Dividing' and it has been written by teachers to help you if you are studying the subject at middle school. Playing educational quizzes is a fabulous way to learn if you are in the 6th, 7th or 8th grade - aged 11 to 14.

It costs only $12.50 per month to play this quiz and over 3,500 others that help you with your school work. You can subscribe on the page at Join Us

This quiz will continue our review of exponents and how they work. Besides being able to add and subtract numbers with exponents, we can also multiply and divide. The rules regarding addition and subtraction of numbers with exponents continue to apply here so let’s look at the following practice example and see how the problem is worked to find the solution.

32 x 24 =
3 x 3 = 9
2 x 2 = 4 x 2 = 8 x 2 = 16
9 x 16 = 144
Solution: 32 x 24 = 144

For each of the following exponent multiplication or division problems listed below, find the correct solution. (Note: Round numbers to the nearest one hundredth.)

1.
172 - 83 ÷ 30 =
1.5
1.93
-7.43
.33
172 - 83 ÷ 30 =
17 x 17 = 289
8 x 8 = 64 x 8 = 512
289 - 512 = -223 ÷ 30 = -7.43
Solution: 172 - 83 ÷ 30 = -7.43
Answer (c) is correct
2.
72 x 35 =
210
72
11907
147
72 x 35 =
7 x 7 = 49
3 x 3 = 9 x 3 = 27 x 3 = 81 x 3 = 243
49 x 243 = 11907
Solution: 72 x 35 = 11907
Answer (c) is correct
3.
442 x 112 =
1936
234256
598
968
442 x 112 =
44 x 44 = 1936
11 x 11 = 121
1936 x 121 = 234256
Solution: 442 x 112 = 234256
Answer (b) is correct
4.
253 ÷ 152 =
694.4
50
69.44
2250
253 ÷ 152 =
25 x 25 = 625 x 25 = 15625
15 x 15 = 225
15625 ÷ 225 = 69.44
Solution: 253 ÷ 152 = 69.44
Answer (c) is correct
5.
64 x 23 =
84
50
144
10368
64 x 23 =
6 x 6 = 36 x 6 = 216 x 6 = 1296
2 x 2 = 4 x 2 = 8
1296 x 8 = 10368
Solution: 64 x 23 = 10368
Answer (d) is correct
6.
93 ÷ 44 =
2.85
1.69
1.5
216
93 ÷ 44 =
93 ÷ 44 =
9 x 9 = 81 x 9 = 729
4 x 4 = 16 x 4 = 64 x 4 = 256
729 ÷ 256 = 2.85
Solution: 93 ÷ 44 = 2.85
Answer (a) is correct
7.
43 x 52 =
2045
1600
120
160
43 x 52 =
4 x 4 = 16 x 4 = 64
5 x 5 = 25
64 x 25 = 1600
Solution: 43 x 52 = 1600
Answer (b) is correct
8.
103 x 202 ÷ 500 =
800
2.4
2
.57
103 x 202 ÷ 500 =
10 x 10 = 100 x 10 = 1000
20 x 20 = 400
1000 x 400 = 400000 ÷ 500 = 800
Solution: 103 x 202 ÷ 500 = 800
Answer (a) is correct
9.
162 ÷ 25 =
6.4
2.57
3.2
8
162 ÷ 25 =
16 x 16 = 256
2 x 2 = 4 x 2 = 8 x 2 = 16 x 2 = 32
256 ÷ 32 = 8
Solution: 162 ÷ 25 = 8
Answer (d) is correct
10.
34 x 36 ÷ 6 =
42.67
10.5
36
9841.5
34 x 36 ÷ 6 =
3 x 3 = 9 x 3 = 27 x 3 = 81
3 x 3 = 9 x 3 = 27 x 3 = 81 x 3 = 243 x 3 = 729
81 x 729 = 59049 ÷ 6 = 9841.5
Solution: 34 x 36 ÷ 6 = 9841.5
Answer (d) is correct
Author:  Christine G. Broome

© Copyright 2016-2019 - Education Quizzes
TJS - Web Design Lincolnshire
View Printout in HTML

Valid HTML5

We use cookies to make your experience of our website better.

To comply with the new e-Privacy directive, we need to ask for your consent - I agree - No thanks - Find out more