*This Math quiz is called 'Multiplication and Division 1' and it has been written by teachers to help you if you are studying the subject at middle school. Playing educational quizzes is a fabulous way to learn if you are in the 6th, 7th or 8th grade - aged 11 to 14.*

* It costs only $12.50 per month to play this quiz and over 3,500 others that help you with your school work. You can subscribe on the page at Join Us*

Multiplication and division is multiplying and dividing numbers. In this middle school Math quiz, you'll learn a few techniques that will help you multiply and divide numbers more easily. Learn as many of these techniques as you think may be useful to you. Knowing your times tables is always useful when it comes to multiplying and dividing.

These questions are longer than usual as they have an extra tip added to them. You might have your own way of doing things, but if you learn the tips, it could improve your math and make you twice as fast! Being able to calculate quickly isn't just for show; it comes in handy when you are out & about and haven't got the time or a pencil & paper to hand.

Take your time and if you want extra practice, try out some of the tips with other numbers too.

1.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To divide a number by another number which is a multiple of 10 and whose only non zero digit is the leading digit 1: move the decimal point (d.p.) to the left by the same number of zeros that are in the multiple of 10. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

76,345 ÷ 1,000 = ?

TIP: To divide a number by another number which is a multiple of 10 and whose only non zero digit is the leading digit 1: move the decimal point (d.p.) to the left by the same number of zeros that are in the multiple of 10. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

76,345 ÷ 1,000 = ?

76.345

763.45

7,634.5

0.76345

76,345 = 76,345.0 so 76,345.0 ÷ 1,000 = 76.345: you have to put in the zero to show that there is no whole number part

2.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 25: multiply by 100, then divide by 4.

816 × 25 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 25: multiply by 100, then divide by 4.

816 × 25 = ?

24,000

20,040

20,400

20,004

816 × 25 = (816 × 100) × 4 = 81,600 ÷ 4 = 20,400

3.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To divide a number by 25: divide by 100, then multiply by 4.

225 ÷ 25 = ?

TIP: To divide a number by 25: divide by 100, then multiply by 4.

225 ÷ 25 = ?

8

10

9

7

225 ÷ 25 = (225 ÷ 100) × 4 = 2.25 × 4 = 9

4.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To divide a number by 5: first multiply by 2 and then move the decimal point (d.p.) to the left.

888 ÷ 5 = ?

TIP: To divide a number by 5: first multiply by 2 and then move the decimal point (d.p.) to the left.

888 ÷ 5 = ?

17,760

17.76

1,776

177.6

888 ÷ 5 = (888 × 2) = 1,776. Move the d.p. 1 place to the left gives 177.6

5.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 11, first multiply the number by 10, then add the original number to it.

96 × 11 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 11, first multiply the number by 10, then add the original number to it.

96 × 11 = ?

1,605

1,056

1,560

1,065

96 × 11 = (96 × 10) + 96 = 1,056

6.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 8: multiply the number by 2, then by 2 again, and finally by 2.

120 × 8 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 8: multiply the number by 2, then by 2 again, and finally by 2.

120 × 8 = ?

609

906

960

690

120 × 2 = 240; 240 × 2 = 480; 480 × 2 = 960

7.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 9: first multiply the number by 10, then subtract the original number from it.

47 × 9 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 9: first multiply the number by 10, then subtract the original number from it.

47 × 9 = ?

432

423

342

324

47 × 9 = (47 × 10) - 47 = 423

8.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by another number which is a multiple of 10 and whose only non zero digit is the leading digit 1: move the decimal point (d.p.) to the right by the same number of zeros that are in the multiple of 10. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

34.56 × 100 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by another number which is a multiple of 10 and whose only non zero digit is the leading digit 1: move the decimal point (d.p.) to the right by the same number of zeros that are in the multiple of 10. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

34.56 × 100 = ?

345.6

3,456

34,560

0.3456

34.56 × 100 = 3,456

9.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 5: first divide by 2, then move the decimal point (d.p.) to the right. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

3,434 × 5 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 5: first divide by 2, then move the decimal point (d.p.) to the right. Note: whole numbers that do not have decimal parts are written without a d.p. e.g. 200.0 = 200: in such cases the d.p. is not normally needed.

3,434 × 5 = ?

17,107

17,017

17,710

17,170

3,434 × 5 = (3,434 ÷ 2) = 1,717. Move the d.p. 1 place to the right gives 17,170. TIP: All odd numbers multiplied by 5 end in 5, and all even numbers multiplied by 5 end in 0

10.

Using the tip, what is the correct answer to the given calculation?

TIP: To multiply a number by 12, first multiply the number by 10, then add twice the original number to it.

38 × 12 = ?

TIP: To multiply a number by 12, first multiply the number by 10, then add twice the original number to it.

38 × 12 = ?

456

465

645

546

38 × 12 = (38 × 10) + (2 × 38) = 380 + 76 = 456

You've had your free 15 questions for today. Interested in playing more? You'll need to subscribe.

If you are a student, visit our Students page.

If you are a teacher, sign up for a free 30-day trial. (We will require your email address at the school for verification purposes.)