Welcome to this, the third quiz in our Difficult section of Eleven Plus maths quizzes on Multiplication and Division. In the first we learned about multiplying and dividing multiples of ten, like 100, 1,000 or 10,000. In the second we made things a little trickier and gave you some tips. In this quiz we shall help you learn how to do your calculations when dealing with decimals and large numbers.

If you have played our other quizzes, then this one shouldn’t be too hard – as long as you remember what you’ve learned! There are some simple ways to work out the answers, which you might not have thought of. Make sure you read all the helpful comments which follow the questions. They’ll make everything much easier to understand!

If you feel confident enough, put your calculators away and only use paper and pencil if you really must. Working out the answers in your head will hone your mind and sharpen your maths skills!

1.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

167.93628 x 10,000 = ?

167.93628 x 10,000 = ?

167,936.28

1,679.3682

16,793,628

1,679,362.8

To multiply by 10,000 simply move the digits 4 places to the left:
167.93628 x 10,000 = 1,679,362.8

2.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

8,300 ÷ 200 = ?

8,300 ÷ 200 = ?

40

40.5

41

41.5

To divide a number by 200: just divide by 2, then divide by 100:

8,300 ÷ 200 = (8,300 ÷ 2) ÷ 100 = 4,150 ÷ 100 = 41.5

8,300 ÷ 200 = (8,300 ÷ 2) ÷ 100 = 4,150 ÷ 100 = 41.5

3.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

96,000 ÷ 3,000 = ?

96,000 ÷ 3,000 = ?

3.2

32

320

3,200

To divide a number by 3,000 just divide the number by 3, then by 1,000.

Another option, as both numbers end with “000” is to ignore them and divide 96 by 3 – simple!

Another option, as both numbers end with “000” is to ignore them and divide 96 by 3 – simple!

4.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

197.726 x 110 = ?

197.726 x 110 = ?

2,174,986

217,498.6

21,749.86

2,174.986

To multiply a number by 110: first multiply by 10, then multiply the original number by 100 and ad the two answers together:

197.726 x 10 = 1,977.26

197.726 x 100 = 19,772.6

1,977.26 + 19,772.6 = 21,749.86

197.726 x 10 = 1,977.26

197.726 x 100 = 19,772.6

1,977.26 + 19,772.6 = 21,749.86

5.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

16,714 ÷ 10,000 = ?

16,714 ÷ 10,000 = ?

167.14

16.714

1.6714

0.16714

To divide by 10,000 simply move the digits 4 places to the right:

16,714 ÷ 10,000 = 1.6714

16,714 ÷ 10,000 = 1.6714

6.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

83 x 120 = ?

83 x 120 = ?

9,200

9,480

9,960

10,020

To multiply a number by 120, first multiply by 100 and remember your answer. Next, divide your answer by 5 and add this to your first answer:

83 x 120 = (83 x 100) + (83 x 100) ÷ 5 = 8,300 + (8,300 ÷ 5) = 8,300 + 1,660 = 9,960

83 x 120 = (83 x 100) + (83 x 100) ÷ 5 = 8,300 + (8,300 ÷ 5) = 8,300 + 1,660 = 9,960

7.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

27.83 x 105 = ?

27.83 x 105 = ?

2,922.15

2,783

3,162.83

3,227

To multiply a number by 105, first multiply the number by 10 and halve it, then multiply the original number by 100 and add your two answers together:

27.83 x 5 = (27.83 x 10) ÷ 2 = 278.3 ÷ 2 = 139.15

27.83 x 100 = 2,783

2,783 + 139.15 = 2,922.15

27.83 x 5 = (27.83 x 10) ÷ 2 = 278.3 ÷ 2 = 139.15

27.83 x 100 = 2,783

2,783 + 139.15 = 2,922.15

8.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

68 x 95 = ?

68 x 95 = ?

6,460

6,350

6,240

6,130

To multiply a number by 95, first multiply the number by 100 and remember your answer. Next, times the original number by 10 and half it. Finally, subtract your second answer from your first:

68 x 95 = (68 x 100) - (68 x 10) ÷ 2 = 6,800 - (680 ÷ 2) = 6,800 - 340 = 6,460

68 x 95 = (68 x 100) - (68 x 10) ÷ 2 = 6,800 - (680 ÷ 2) = 6,800 - 340 = 6,460

9.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

46,000 ÷ 99 = ?

46,000 ÷ 99 = ?

466.466

464.646

462.462

460.46

To divide a number by 99, you can often just divide by 100 and repeat the number itself (ignoring any zeros):
46,000 ÷ 100 = 46 but 46,000 ÷ 99 = 464.64646464 etc…

10.

What is the correct answer to the given calculation?

75 ÷ 15 = ?

75 ÷ 15 = ?

4

5

6

7

That was an easy one! Did you know, when asked to divide more difficult numbers by 15, you can use this trick - first divide by 10, then multiply by 2, and finally divide by 3:

75 ÷ 15 = ((75 ÷ 10) x 2) ÷ 3 = (7.5 x 2) ÷ 3 = 15 ÷ 3 = 5

75 ÷ 15 = ((75 ÷ 10) x 2) ÷ 3 = (7.5 x 2) ÷ 3 = 15 ÷ 3 = 5