Multiplication and division illustration | A cube
‘Cubed’ means multiplied by itself twice, just like finding the volume of a cube: vol = b x h x w.

Multiplication and Division 3 (Very Easy)

Welcome to the third in our series of Very Easy Eleven Plus maths quizzes on Multiplication and Division. These can be testing at times – especially when dealing with large numbers. They often require pencils and paper for you to do your calculations but, you’ll be happy to hear, there are some simple ways to work many of them out.

Here’s an example: if you are asked to multiply a number by 95, then all you have to do is multiply it by 100, then multiply it by 5, and finally subtract the smaller number from the larger one:

8 x 95 = (8 x 100) - (8 x 5) = 800 - 40 = 760

See how easy it is when you can simplify the calculation. Read the helpful comments after each question for more tips which will help you revise for your exams. Good luck!

1.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
12 x 40
240
360
480
600
To multiply by 40, first multiply by 4 then by 10: 12 x 4 = 48, then 48 x 10 = 480
2.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
93 x 101
9,193
9,293
9,393
9,483
A quick way to multiply by 101 is to first multiply by 100, then add the original number: 93 x 100 = 9,300, then 9,300 + 93 = 9,393
3.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
3 cubed
27
9
15
12
‘Cubed’ means multiplied by itself twice, just like finding the volume of a cube: vol = b x h x w.
3 x 3 x 3 = 27
4.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
57,000 ÷ 3,000
18
19
20
21
To quickly divide by 3,000, first divide by 1,000, then divide your answer by 3: 57,000 ÷ 1,000 = 57, then 57 ÷ 3 = 19
5.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
90 x 300
2,700,000
270,000
2,700
27,000
To multiply by 300, first multiply by three, then by 100: 90 x 3 = 270, then 270 x 100 = 27,000. Alternatively, if both numbers end with zeroes, these can be removed and added again at the end:
9 x 3 = 27. We removed 3 zeros, so we add them again to get 27,000
6.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
425 ÷ 5
85
75
65
55
To quickly divide by 5, first divide by 10 then double your answer: 425 ÷ 10 = 42.5, then 42.5 x 2 = 85
7.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
2,000 x 7.5
12,000
15,000
18,000
21,000
To multiply by 2,000, simply multiply by 2 then by 1,000 by adding 3 zeros:
2 x 7.5 = 15, then 15 x 1,000 = 15,000
8.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
1,080 ÷ 200
4.5
5.4
45
55
To divide by 200, first divide by 100 by moving the decimal point 2 places to the left, then divide by 2:
1,080 ÷ 100 = 10.8, then 10.8 ÷ 2 = 5.4
9.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
6 doubled then squared
12
36
48
144
'Double' means multiply by 2, and ‘squared’ means multiplied by itself:
6 x 2 = 12, then 12 x 12 = 144
10.
What is the correct answer to the given calculation?
64 quartered
4
32
16
8
‘Quartered’ means divided by 4: 64 ÷ 4 = 16
Author:  Frank Evans

© Copyright 2016-2019 - Education Quizzes
TJS - Web Design Lincolnshire
View Printout in HTML

Valid HTML5

We use cookies to make your experience of our website better.

To comply with the new e-Privacy directive, we need to ask for your consent - I agree - No thanks - Find out more